TN HJR0238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Pigeon Forge High School, 2019 state wrestling champion
Title
Pigeon Forge High School, 2019 state wrestling champion
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-04 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-02-28 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-4-19 |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed for introduction |