TN HJR0226 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-25)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee to remove the criminal punishment exception from slavery and involuntary servitude prohibition.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee to remove the criminal punishment exception from slavery and involuntary servitude prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2018-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0849) |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0849) |
2018-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-09 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bill Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-03-27 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-03-23 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed for intro. |