TN HJR0223 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
“Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week,†September 20-26, 2009
Title
“Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week,†September 20-26, 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-16 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Consent cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2009-03-30 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-30 | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-26 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/30/09 | |
2009-03-19 | Filed for intro. |