TN HJR0219 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - R/S H. subst. & concurred in SJR 269
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - R/S H. subst. & concurred in SJR 269
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
James H. Ripley, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Title
James H. Ripley, Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | R/S H. subst. & concurred in SJR 269 |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0219&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HJR0219.pdf |