TN HJR0214 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Reverend Ron Jordan
Title
Reverend Ron Jordan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-21 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-21-19 |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |