TN HJR0205 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 193
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lynne "Michelle" Bowman, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
Lynne "Michelle" Bowman, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 193 |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed for introduction |