TN HJR0190 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 247
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 247
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Kenneth C. Hill, Tennessee Public Utility Commission
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Dr. Kenneth C. Hill as a commissioner of the Tennessee public utility commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 247 |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | House | Intro., ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed for introduction |