TN HJR0188 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a waiver from the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to apply certain safety requirements on certain commercial motor vehicles transporting loads interstate; and requests an amendment to federal safety standards to conform to the Tennessee requirements.
Title
Requests a waiver from the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to apply certain safety requirements on certain commercial motor vehicles transporting loads interstate; and requests an amendment to federal safety standards to conform to the Tennessee requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee | |
2011-03-31 | Intro., ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Filed for intro. |