TN HJR0183 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 69-22)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 69-22)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Honors and commends the members of the Gold Star Mothers and Gold Star Families.
Title
Honors and commends the members of the Gold Star Mothers and Gold Star Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-23 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/23/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed for intro. |