TN HJR0181 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-24)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-24)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Bobby Keel
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize and honor acclaimed songwriter Bobby Keel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2021-03-04 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |