TN HJR0159 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 0167
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Caroline Ezell McAnally, University of Tennessee Southern Advisory Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Caroline Ezell McAnally to the advisory board for the University of Tennessee Southern.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13HouseH. subst. & concurred in SJR 0167
2023-03-13HouseAdopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 2
2023-03-09HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/13/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2023
2023-03-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 3/1/2023
2023-02-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-06HouseIntro., ref. to Education Administration
2023-02-02HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback