TN HJR0153 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-23)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Gerald McCormick

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gerald McCormick

Sponsors

Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]
Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Signed by Governor.
2019-02-25HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-02-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-02-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-21SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
2019-02-13SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-11HouseAll Ayes added as Sponsors
2019-02-11HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3
2019-02-07HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/11/19
2019-02-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback