TN HJR0139 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports recommendations of Agricultural Education and Youth Participation Task Force.
Title
A RESOLUTION in support of the recommendations of the Agricultural Education and Youth Participation Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |