TN HJR0139 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Commemorates May 2015 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month in Tennessee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorates May 2015 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month in Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18 Signed by Governor.
2015-03-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2015-03-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-03-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-03-17HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2015-03-16SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2015-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/16/2015
2015-03-12SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-03-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2015-03-09HouseAdopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 3
2015-03-05HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/9/15
2015-03-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-03HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback