TN HJR0133 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from House, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges federal government to address internet safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges federal government to address internet safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-22HouseAdopted as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0307)
2019-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0394)
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback