TN HJR0132 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee authorizing the governing body or state official charged with carrying out the purpose or objectives of a fund or trust that is administered or invested by the Treasury and that contains state funds, in whole or in part, to adopt, with approval of the Treasurer and the Comptroller of the Treasury, an investment policy to authorize all or part of such fund or trust to be invested such that the state would become an owner, in whole or in part, of any bank or a stockholder with others in any association, company, or corporation.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow the investment of state funds in equities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Special Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |