TN HJR0132 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses support for a teacher's bill of rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses support for a teacher's bill of rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: FINAL CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-05-01HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-05-01HouseAdopted as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-05-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0428)
2019-04-22HouseFinal Regular Calendar
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-16HouseAction def. in Education to 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/16/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-04-01HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., ref. to Education
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback