TN HJR0130 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Article XI, Section 5 to allow the legislature to authorize casinos and games of chance associated with casinos to be operated in Tennessee.
Title
Proposes amendment to Article XI, Section 5 to allow the legislature to authorize casinos and games of chance associated with casinos to be operated in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |