TN HJR0129 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tony Brown
Title
Tony Brown
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-02-16 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2017-02-15 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/16/17 |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |