TN HJR0124 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for a convention of the states to plan for Article V conventions under the United States Constitution; creates a convention committee.
Title
Calls for a convention of the states to plan for Article V conventions under the United States Constitution; creates a convention committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |