TN HJR0122 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Held on desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/19 |
2019-04-11 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0110) |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |