TN HJR0120 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Honors the memories of Zackery Grooms and Chance Black and requests TWRA to erect a marker in remembrance of the young men.
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memories of Chance Black and Zackery Grooms and request the TWRA to erect a marker to memorialize the lives of these two outstanding young men.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-13 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0092) |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2023-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/22/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |