TN HJR0120 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 166
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 166
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jamie Woodson, University of Tennessee Board of Trustees
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Jamie Woodson to the board of trustees of the University of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 166 |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |