TN HJR0118 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 164
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 164
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Marcie Rudd, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Marcie Rudd of Jackson to the State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 164 |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0118&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HJR0118.pdf |