TN HJR0107 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
"Idiopathic Pulmonary Fibrosis Research and Awareness Month," September 2019
Title
"Idiopathic Pulmonary Fibrosis Research and Awareness Month," September 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3-14-19 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |