TN HJR0106 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-25)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-25)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Andrew Michael Keith, Public Safety Medal of Valor.
Title
Andrew Michael Keith, Public Safety Medal of Valor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-03-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 23, Nays 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-02-26 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2015-02-26 | House | Adopted, Ayes 97, Nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/26/15 |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed for intro. |