TN HJR0103 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-26)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

African-American Breast Cancer Awareness Week, September 8-14, 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

African-American Breast Cancer Awareness Week, September 8-14, 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]
Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]
Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]
Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]
Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-02-06HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-06HouseAdopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-02-05HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-6-19
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback