TN HJR0099 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senator Lamar Alexander
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Senator Lamar Alexander for his lifetime of exemplary service to the State of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] |
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/1/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-02-22 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-12 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |