TN HJR0090 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

National Healthy Schools Day

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Healthy Schools Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30 Signed by Governor.
2017-03-29HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-03-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-03-28HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-03-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-03-27SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2017-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-22SenateRecommended for concurrence by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
2017-02-13SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-02-09HouseAdopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
2017-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-08HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/9/17
2017-02-07HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback