TN HJR0088 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Directs that tactile Braille American flag be displayed in public lobby of new legislative office building.
Title
Directs that tactile Braille American flag be displayed in public lobby of new legislative office building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Motion Concur (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-01-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-01-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 1/25/2018 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/23/2018 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0092) |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-07 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |