TN HJR0082 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Linda Cash, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Dr. Linda Cash of Cleveland to the State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate substituted HJR 82 for SJR 79. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |