TN HJR0079 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Tennessee Tree Day," March 20, 2021
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate March 20, 2021, as "Tennessee Tree Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |