TN HJR0078 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Richard Noe Bridge," I-75 in Anderson County
Title
"Richard Noe Bridge," I-75 in Anderson County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-12 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-12 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-12 | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (4) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (4) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Rec. for adoption by S. FW&M Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Rec. For Concurrence. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. Trans Consent cal. for 06/01/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Trans. Comm. | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 3/24/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-20 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., ref. to Transportation | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |