TN HJR0068 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Abigail Beaty, Governor's Volunteer Stars Award

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abigail Beaty, Governor's Volunteer Stars Award

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07 Signed by Governor.
2019-02-06HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-02-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-05HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-02-04SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/4/2019
2019-01-30SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-01-28HouseAdopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-01-24HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/28/2019
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback