TN HJR0065 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Supports use of government-approved marijuana plant products for medicinal purposes if approved by physician based on medical evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supports use of government-approved marijuana plant products for medicinal purposes if approved by physician based on medical evidence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21HouseDef. to Summer Study in Health Committee
2017-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/14/2017
2017-03-07HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 3/14/2017
2017-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/7/2017
2017-03-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Health Committee
2017-02-22HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseIntro., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health
2017-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback