TN HJR0063 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2019
Title
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-02-25 | House | Adopted, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-02-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |