TN HJR0054 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tennessee Farm Bureau Federation, 100th anniversary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commemorate the 100th anniversary of the Tennessee Farm Bureau Federation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02 Signed by Governor.
2021-03-01HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-03-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-02-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-02-25SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/25/2021
2021-02-22SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-02-10HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-02-08HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2021
2021-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback