TN HJR0051 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-25)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-25)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Child Abuse Prevention Month" April 2015.
Title
"Child Abuse Prevention Month" April 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-09 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2015-03-09 | House | Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |