TN HJR0045 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR65
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

William J. Carver, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

William J. Carver, Tennessee Education Lottery Corporation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseH. subst. & concurred in SJR65
2019-01-31HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/4/2019
2019-01-30HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 1/31/2019
2019-01-29HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-01-24HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 1/29/2019
2019-01-19HouseIntro., ref. to State Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback