TN HJR0043 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Taiwan
Title
A RESOLUTION to congratulate Taiwan for its relations with the United States of America.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-02-08 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-01-15 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/8/2021 |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |