TN HJR0037 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee recognizing that our liberties do not come from governments, but from Almighty God.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee recognizing that our liberties do not come from governments, but from Almighty God.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third and Final Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-25HouseReset on cal. for 4/26/2018
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-24SenateConcurred as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 1, PNV 1
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading, as amended
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/19/18
2018-04-18SenatePassed 1st Reading, as amended
2018-04-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment #1
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-05-08HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-08HouseAdopted, Ayes 69, Nays 17, PNV 0
2017-05-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/8/2017
2017-05-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-05HouseReset on cal. for 5/8/2017
2017-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-03HouseReset on cal. for 5/4/2017
2017-05-01HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-01HouseReset on cal. for 5/3/2017
2017-04-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
2017-04-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-25HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017
2017-04-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-11HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-23HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-01HouseFailed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-01-20HouseIntro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-01-20HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback