TN HJR0032 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2017
Title
"Child Abuse Prevention Month," April 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. John Forgety [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-02-27 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/14/2017 |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |