TN HJR0031 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Supports U.S. statehood for Puerto Rico.
Title
Supports U.S. statehood for Puerto Rico.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-20 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 53, Nays 24, PNV 8 |
2017-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0353) |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | Re-ref. State Government Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/15/2017 |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-01-30 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |