TN HJR0031 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 19, 2011, as "East Ridge High School Marching Band Alumni Day" in Tennessee.
Title
Designates March 19, 2011, as "East Ridge High School Marching Band Alumni Day" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0031&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HJR0031.pdf |