TN HJR0028 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Robert White, Coach of the Year
Title
Robert White, Coach of the Year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-02-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-02-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-02-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/1/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-01-11 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/12/17 |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed for intro. |