TN HJR0027 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 68-21)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tennessee Titans, AFC South champions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the Tennessee Titans as American Football Conference South Division champions.

Sponsors

Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]
Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]
Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. London Lamar [D]
Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22 Signed by Governor.
2021-01-21HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-01-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-01-15SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-01-15SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/15/2021
2021-01-14HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-01-14HouseAdopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-01-13HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/14/2021
2021-01-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback