TN HJR0023 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 70-23)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 70-23)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses appreciation and thanks to entities and persons providing assistance during the Smoky Mountain wildfires.
Title
Expresses appreciation and thanks to entities and persons providing assistance during the Smoky Mountain wildfires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-01-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-01-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/12/2017 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2017-01-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-01-11 | House | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-01-11 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2017-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/11/17 |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |