TN HJR0018 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/15/2021
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the governor to implement the TennCare III demonstration waiver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to authorize the TennCare III Demonstration Waiver pursuant to Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 71-5-163.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 1/15/2021
2021-01-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 1/14/2021
2021-01-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-01-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 1/14/2021
2021-01-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/14/2021
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-01-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-14HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 1/14/2021
2021-01-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-01-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 1/14/2021
2021-01-13HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-01-13HouseIntro., ref. to Insurance Committee
2021-01-12HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback