TN HJR0017 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee recognizing that our liberties do not come from government, but from Almighty God.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Tennessee recognizing that our liberties do not come from government, but from Almighty God.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-18HouseAdopted, Ayes 73, Nays 17, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/19
2019-04-11HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19
2019-04-10HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-27HouseAction deferred to Constitutional Amendment Calendar
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-02-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 2/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseReassigned to Judiciary
2019-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-01-18HouseIntro., ref. to State Committee
2019-01-11HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback