TN HJR0011 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-24)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Metropolitan Nashville Police Officers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor those venerable members of the Metropolitan Nashville Police Department for their selfless acts of heroism.

Sponsors

Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Jason Potts [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]
Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Torrey Harris [D]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]
Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]
Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Mark White [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Dave Wright [R]
Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-01-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22 Signed by Governor.
2021-01-21HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-01-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-20HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-20HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-01-15SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2021-01-14SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/15/2021
2021-01-14SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-13HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-01-13HouseAdopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-01-12HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 1/13/2021
2021-01-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback